Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2716948
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.05.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
25.01.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.07.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
11.09.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
11.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
17.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|