Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2716948 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU2011121427 | 30.05.2011 | WO2012RU00383 | 15.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012166011 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU2011121427 | 30.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2457385 | 27.07.2012 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU2011121427 | 30.05.2011 |