EP2716948 - UNIVERSAL, HIGH-TORQUE, MULTI-TURN ELECTRIC DRIVE FOR SHUT-OFF VALVES USED IN PIPELINE TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federalnoe Gosudarstvennoe Budgetnoe Obrazovatelnoe Uchregdenie Vishego Professionalnogo Obrazonavia Prospekt Lenina 92 Tula 300600 / RU | For all designated states Otkritoe Akcionernoe Obshestvo "Michurinski Zavod "Progress"" Lipetskoe shosse 113 Michurinsk, Tambovskaya obl. 393773 / RU | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRJAZEV, Mikhail Vasilievich Prospekt Lenina 62-53 Tula 300012 / RU | 02 /
SIDOROV, Petr Grigorievich Bundurina 36-26 Tula 300000 / RU | 03 /
DMITRIEV, Vladimir Anatolievich ul. Naberegnaja 70 Michurinsk Tambovskaya obl. 393760 / RU | 04 /
DMITRIEV, Andrei Vladimirovich Naberegnaja 70 Michurinsk Tambovskaya obl. 393760 / RU | 05 /
KUHAR, Vladimir Denisovich ul. 9 Maja 8A-29 Tula 300028 / RU | 06 /
RASPOPOV, Vladimir Jakovlevich ul. M. Tareza 10-8 Tula 300000 / RU | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Fischer, Franz IPTO AG International Patent and Trademark Office Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 12792352.2 | 15.05.2012 | WO2012RU00383 | Priority number, date | RU20110121427 | 30.05.2011 Original published format: RU 2011121427 | [2014/15] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012166011 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | RU | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716948 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/05, F16H37/08 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
F16H1/46 (EP);
F16K31/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLER ELEKTROANTRIEB MIT HOHEM DREHMOMENT UND MEHREREN WINDUNGEN FÜR SPERRVENTILE IN EINEM ROHRTRANSPORT | [2014/15] | English: | UNIVERSAL, HIGH-TORQUE, MULTI-TURN ELECTRIC DRIVE FOR SHUT-OFF VALVES USED IN PIPELINE TRANSPORT | [2014/15] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE UNIVERSEL À TOURS MULTIPLES À MOMENT ÉLEVÉ DES ÉQUIPEMENTS DE FERMETURE D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT PAR PIPELINE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2013 | Translation filed | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.07.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.2014 | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SU363832 (GOLDIN L.S. ET AL.); | [A]RU2170871 (TULAEHLEKTROPRIVOD AOOT); | [A]RU2307278 (OOO INT KLASS [RU], et al); | [A]EP0851163 (HOLTER GMBH & CO [DE]) | by applicant | RU2276751 | RU2258168 |