EP2713933 - MEDICAL PROCEDURE KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/15] | MEDICAL KIT, PACKAGING SYSTEM, INSTRUCTION INSERT, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | ||
[2021/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medline Industries, LP Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | [2021/50] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Medline Industries, Inc. One Medline Place Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACINNES, Susan E. 33 Little Marryat Road Trout Valley, IL 60013 / US | 02 /
TOMES, Jennifer E. P.O. Box 7432 Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | 03 /
ZYBURT, Sarah 522 West Belden Apartment L1 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/02] |
Former [2014/15] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 12792423.1 | 24.05.2012 | [2022/02] | WO2012US39311 | Priority number, date | US201113153300 | 03.06.2011 Original published format: US201113153300 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012166506 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713933 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2713933 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M5/00, G09B5/06, A61B50/30, A61B50/33, // A61B1/00, A61B42/00, A61B46/00 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US);
A61M25/002 (EP,US);
G09B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B1/00144 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3015 (EP,US);
A61B42/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | A61B19/02, A61G12/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/15] | A61B19/02, G09B19/24, A61G12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KIT FÜR MEDIZINISCHE EINGRIFFE | [2021/32] | English: | MEDICAL PROCEDURE KIT | [2021/32] | French: | KIT POUR LES PROCÉDURES MÉDICALES | [2021/32] |
Former [2014/15] | MEDIZINISCHES KIT, VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM, INSTRUKTIONSEINSATZ UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/15] | MEDICAL KIT, PACKAGING SYSTEM, INSTRUCTION INSERT, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | ||
Former [2014/15] | TROUSSE MÉDICALE, SYSTÈME D'EMBALLAGE, INSERT D'INSTRUCTIONS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.07.2021 | 12.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2012 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | MT | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | TR | 12.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | IE | 24.05.2022 | LU | 24.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | FR | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
TR | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NO | 12.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5954369 (SEABROOK MARCH E [US]); | [A]US6579271 (ARUFFO SYLVIA D [US], et al); | [A]WO2005027767 (ITL HEALTHCARE PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [I]US2008283426 (PRIMER JONATHAN S [US], et al); | [I]US2010311026 (TOMES JENNIFER E [US], et al); | [A]US2010307942 (TOMES JENNIFER E [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5954369 (SEABROOK MARCH E [US]); | [A]US2003038475 (STANCIL MICHELLE D [US]); | [A]US7401703 (MCMICHAEL DONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US7624869 (PRIMER JONATHAN S [US]); | [A]US2010311026 (TOMES JENNIFER E [US], et al) | Examination | US3107786 | US4523679 | US5778574 | by applicant | US5954369 | US6579271 | WO2005027767 | US2008283426 | US2010311026 |