12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
19.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
31.03.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] |
24.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
03.02.2017 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
27.05.2016 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
22.04.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.11.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
08.08.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
25.07.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
07.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
21.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|