Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9334662 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2016 | B2 | US2014290165 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161492045 | 01.06.2011 | US201213486890 | 01.06.2012 | US201414307584 | 18.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8795808 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2013045351 | 21.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161492045 | 01.06.2011 | US201213486890 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3106497 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12792716 | 01.06.2012 | US201161492045 | 01.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2836312 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2017 | C | CA2836312 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161492045 | 01.06.2011 | WO2012US40530 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2714830 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2016 | B1 | EP2714830 | 31.12.2014 | A4 | EP2714830 | 09.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161492045 | 01.06.2011 | WO2012US40530 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012167132 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2013 | A3 | WO2012167132 | 06.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161492045 | 01.06.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP3106497 |