EP2688303 - RECORDING DEVICE, RECORDING METHOD, PLAYBACK DEVICE, PLAYBACK METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING/PLAYBACK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMADA Toshiya c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
ARIDOME Kenichiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
MAE Atsushi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2014/04] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12793581.5 | 22.05.2012 | WO2012JP63031 | Priority number, date | JP20110120187 | 30.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011120187 | [2014/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012165218 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2688303 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N5/77, H04N9/82, H04N9/804, H04N19/597, H04N19/70, // H04N5/765 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/189 (US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
H04N5/91 (KR);
H04N5/92 (KR);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | H04N13/00, H04N5/225, H04N5/91, H04N5/92, H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG, WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM SOWIE AUFZEICHNUNGS-/WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2014/04] | English: | RECORDING DEVICE, RECORDING METHOD, PLAYBACK DEVICE, PLAYBACK METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING/PLAYBACK DEVICE | [2014/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE REPRODUCTION, PROGRAMME, ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT/REPRODUCTION | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2013 | Translation filed | 18.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 05.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006104351 (ERSITY INDUSTRY ACADEMIA COOPE [KR], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0102] *; | [A]EP2088789 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0081]; figures 11-13 *; | [I]WO2009119955 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0097] *; | [A]WO2010064774 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [P]EP2357823 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [P] * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0072] *; | [I] - "Annex H: Multiview video coding", vol. ITU-T H.264, (20090301), pages 596 - 647, RECOMMENDATION ITU-T H.264, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, URL: http://www.itu.int/rec/T-REC-H.264-200903-S/en, XP008147017 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - A VETRO ET AL, "Overview of the Stereo and Multiview Video Coding Extensions of the H.264/MPEG-4 AVC Standard", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (20110401), vol. 99, no. 4, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2010.2098830, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 626 - 642, XP055132298 [A] 1-12 * page 626 - page 637 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2010.2098830 | International search | [A]JP2010157826 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]WO2010085361 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al); | [A]JP2011502375 (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE); | [A]WO2011024373 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2007280516 |