EP2713727 - COMBINATION OF MEK INHIBITORS AND SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF AURORA A KINASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd. Oncology DDU C-1 2F 1110 26-1 Muraokahigashi 2-chome Fujisawa Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAKRAVARTY, Arijit 2 Hawthorne Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 02 /
VINCENT, Patrick C/o Takeda California, Inc. 10410 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2021/13] |
Former [2014/15] | 01 /
CHAKRAVARTY, Arijit 2 Hawthorne Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | ||
02 /
VINCENT, Patrick C/o Takeda California Inc. 10410 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/13] |
Former [2014/15] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12793812.4 | 04.06.2012 | [2021/13] | WO2012US40733 | Priority number, date | US201161493217P | 03.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161493217 P | US201261613207P | 20.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261613207 P | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012167247 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713727 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2713727 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/519, A61K31/55, A61P35/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2014/15] | A01N43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | 02.01.2014 | ME | 02.01.2014 | Title | German: | KOMBINATION AUS MEK-HEMMERN UND SELEKTIVEN HEMMERN DER AURORA-A-KINASE | [2014/15] | English: | COMBINATION OF MEK INHIBITORS AND SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF AURORA A KINASE | [2014/15] | French: | COMBINAISON D'INHIBITEURS DE MEK ET D'INHIBITEURS SÉLECTIFS DE KINASE AURORA A | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 14.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2012 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | IE | 04.06.2021 | LU | 04.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 04.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 04.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2008063525 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * pages 26-27, paragraph 65 * * claim - *; | [YD]US7572784 (CLAIBORNE CHRISTOPHER F [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * claim - * * column 295, lines 7-8, 11-12, 38-39 *; | [X] - CARVAJAL RICHARD D ET AL, "Aurora kinases: new targets for cancer therapy", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20061201), vol. 12, no. 23, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-06-1405, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6869 - 6875, XP002487803 [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * page 6872; table 2; compound ZM447439 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-06-1405 | [X] - E DOTAN ET AL, "The ongoing roll-out of Aurora kinase inhibitors in cancer treatment ;", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (20101001), vol. 35, no. 10, doi:10.1358/dof.2010.35.10.1529819, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 845 - 858, XP055140135 [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * page 852; table III; compounds ZM-447439 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2010.035.010.1529819 | [Y] - TSENG YA-SHIH ET AL, "Aurora-A overexpression enhances cell-aggregation of Ha-ras transformants through the MEK/ERK signaling pathway", BMC CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20091212), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2407-9-435, ISSN 1471-2407, page 435, XP021067002 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2407-9-435 | International search | [Y]WO2008079814 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al); | [X]US2010004247 (MUNDT KIRSTEN ELISABETH [DE], et al); | [A]US2010227838 (SHAH OMAR JAMEEL [US], et al); | [E] - PUBCHEM, Database accession no. CID 24771867, URL: NCBI, XP003032516 | [A] - DONG ET AL., "Discovery of TAK-733, a potent and selective MEK allosteric site inhibitor for the treatment of cancer", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20110122), vol. 21, pages 1315 - 1319, XP028144471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.01.071 | by applicant | WO2005111039 | US2008045501 | WO2008021038 | WO2008063525 | WO2008079814 | US2008167292 | US7572784 | US2010004247 | US7718648 | WO2010059503 | WO2010134965 | US2010310651 | WO2011014248 | US2011039826 | US8026246 | US2011245234 | - Curr. Med. Chem., (20070000), vol. 14, pages 969 - 985 | - Embo J, (19980000), vol. 17, pages 3052 - 3065 | - Genetics, (19930000), vol. 135, pages 677 - 691 | - Cell, (19950000), vol. 81, pages 95 - 105 | - JCell Sci, (19980000), vol. 111, pages 557 - 572 | - Mol Cancer Ther, (20070000), vol. 6, pages 1851 - 1857 | - J Cell Biol, (20010000), vol. 152, pages 669 - 682 | - J Cell Biol, (20030000), vol. 161, pages 281 - 294 | - Curr Biol, (20020000), vol. 12, pages 894 - 899 | - Genes Cells, (20050000), vol. 10, pages 127 - 137 | - Mol Biol Cell, (20030000), vol. 14, pages 3325 - 3341 | - Mol Cancer Ther, (20090000), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 2046 - 56 | - Int J Cancer, (20060000), vol. 118, pages 357 - 363 | - J Natl Cancer Inst, (20020000), vol. 94, pages 1320 - 1329 | - Int J Oncol, (20040000), vol. 25, pages 1631 - 1639 | - Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 67, pages 10436 - 10444 | - Clin Cancer Res, (20040000), vol. 10, pages 2065 - 2071 | - Clin Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 13, pages 4098 - 4104 | - Int J Cancer, (20010000), vol. 92, pages 370 - 373 | - Br J Cancer, (20010000), vol. 84, pages 824 - 831 | - JNatl Cancer Inst, (20020000), vol. 94, pages 1320 - 1329 | - Cancer Res, (20020000), vol. 62, pages 4115 - 4122 | - Mol Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 7, pages 678 - 688 | - Oncogene, (20060000), vol. 25, pages 1153 - 7158 | - Cell Res, (20060000), vol. 16, pages 356 - 366 | - Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, pages 4305 - 4314 | - Nat Genet, (19980000), vol. 20, pages 189 - 193 | - Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol, (20030000), vol. 4, pages 842 - 854 | - Curr Top Dev Biol, (20000000), vol. 49, pages 331 - 42 | - Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol, (20010000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 21 - 32 | - J Cell Sci, (20070000), vol. 120, pages 2987 - 2996 | - Trends Cell Biol, (19990000), vol. 9, pages 454 - 459 | - Trends Cell Biol, (20050000), vol. 15, pages 241 - 250 | - The Journal of biological chemistry, (20030000), vol. 278, pages 51786 - 51795 | - Mol Cell Biol, (20070000), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 4513 - 25 | - Cell Cycle, (20080000), vol. 7, no. 17, pages 2691 - 704 | - Cell Cycle, (20090000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 876 - 88 | - Mol Cancer Res, (20100000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 373 - 84 | - Mol. Cancer Ther, (20090000), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 2046 - 56 | - Oncogene, (19990000), vol. 18, pages 813 - 822 | - J. Clin. Invest., (19970000), vol. 99, pages 1478 - 1483 | - Cancer Res, (20050000), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4870 - 80 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20070000), vol. 104, page 4106 | - Chem Biol., (20080000), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 552 - 62 | - BERGE et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - Oncogene, (20070000), vol. 26, pages 4689 - 98 | - Mol Biol Cell, (20060000), vol. 17, pages 5227 - 40 | - Cancer Res., (20080000), vol. 68, pages 5113 - 21 | - Cell Cycle, (20110000), vol. 10, pages 481 - 91 |