EP2716688 - NOVEL ORGANO POLYSILOXANE ELASTOMER AND USE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Toray Co., Ltd. 2-24, Higashishinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/35] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA Seiki c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 02 /
SOUDA Tatsuo c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 03 /
HORI Seiji c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Ede, Eric Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12793968.4 | 22.05.2012 | WO2012JP63074 | Priority number, date | JP20110121097 | 30.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011121097 | [2014/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012165228 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716688 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/50, C08G77/46, C08L83/12, C08L83/14, A61K8/89, A61K47/34, A61Q1/00, A61Q5/00, A61Q15/00, A61Q17/04 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
A61K8/892 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/48 (KR);
A61K47/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/893 (US);
A61K8/895 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61Q1/00 (KR);
A61Q1/12 (KR);
A61Q15/00 (KR);
A61Q17/04 (KR);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/007 (US);
A61Q19/08 (US);
A61Q5/00 (KR,US);
C08G77/46 (EP,US);
C08G77/50 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08L83/12 (EP,US);
C08L83/14 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | NEUES ORGANOPOLYSILOXANELASTOMER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/15] | English: | NOVEL ORGANO POLYSILOXANE ELASTOMER AND USE THEREFOR | [2014/15] | French: | NOUVEL ÉLASTOMÈRE D'ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE ET SON UTILISATION | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2013 | Translation filed | 24.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 23.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004253197 (SAKUTA KOJI [JP]); | [X]US2008273168 (RATHORE OSMAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011049247 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011049248 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP], et al); | International search | [X]JP2007504312 (3M ESPE AG.); | [A]WO2011049248 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011049246 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008115358 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |