EP2763978 - CARBAMATE/ UREA DERIVATIVES CONTAINING PIPERIDIN AND PIPERAZIN RINGS AS H3 RECEPTOR INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/33] | CARBAMATE/ UREA DERIVATIVES CONTAINING PIPERIDIN AND PIPERAZIN RINGS AS H3 RECEPTOR INHIBITORS | ||
[2016/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Tielin Shanghai ChemPartner Co. Ltd. No. 5 Building 998 Halei Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xuechun Shanghai ChemPartner Co., Ltd. Room 108, No.2 Building 998 Halei Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2014/40] |
Former [2014/33] | 01 /
WANG, Tielin Shanghai ChemPartner Co. Ltd. No. 5 Building 998 Halei Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Xuechun Shanghai ChemPartner Co. Ltd. No. 5 Building 998 Halei Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | Representative(s) | Gabarda Ortega, Ana Esther Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2014/33] | Application number, filing date | 12795066.5 | 08.10.2012 | [2017/05] | WO2012IB55424 | Priority number, date | WO2011CN80529 | 08.10.2011 Original published format: PCT/CN2011/080529 | WO2012CN81326 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: PCT/CN2012/081326 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013050987 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763978 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2763978 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D417/04, C07D487/04, C07D401/14, C07D417/14, C07D211/46, A61K31/496, A61P25/00 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D211/46 (EP,CN,US);
C07D211/94 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBAMAT- UND HARNSTOFFDERIVATE ENTHALTEND PIPERIDIN- UND PIPERAZINRESTE ALS H3 REZEPTOR INHIBITOREN | [2016/13] | English: | CARBAMATE/ UREA DERIVATIVES CONTAINING PIPERIDIN AND PIPERAZIN RINGS AS H3 RECEPTOR INHIBITORS | [2016/13] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE CARBAMATE ET DE L'URÉE CONTENANT DES GROUPS DE PIPERIDINE ET DE PIPERAZINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE RECEPTEUR H3 | [2016/37] |
Former [2014/33] | CARBAMAT-/HARNSTOFFDERIVATE MIT PIPERIDIN- UND PIPERAZINRINGEN ALS H3-REZEPTORINHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2014/33] | CARBAMATE/ UREA DERIVATIVES CONTAINING PIPERIDIN AND PIPERAZIN RINGS AS H3 RECEPTOR INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2014/33] | DÉRIVÉS DE CARBAMATES/URÉE CONTENANT DES CYCLES PIPÉRIDINE ET PIPÉRAZINE UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR H3 | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 10.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2012 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | IE | 08.10.2017 | LU | 08.10.2017 | MT | 08.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2007016496 (NEUROGEN CORP [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * compounds 14, 90-94, 145, 146, 148, 153; page 244 - page 251; example 2; claim - *; | [A]EP1970373 (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * table 45-example 353; page 142, lines 55-58; claim - *; | [XA]EP0614664 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 19, line 15 - page 20, line 35; claim -; compound 63 * [A] 7-15; | [X]EP0169139 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [X] 15 * examples 11-14 *; | [X] - BARRETT ET AL, "Novel, potent P<2>-P<3> pyrrolidine derivatives of ketoamide-based cathepsin K inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20060315), vol. 16, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2005.11.101, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1735 - 1739, XP005280788 [X] 15 * compound 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.11.101 | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20110815), Database accession no. 1317671-39-8, URL: STN, XP002692465 [X] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2007052124 | WO2007016496 | WO2004101546 | WO2004078163 | - LAZEWSKA; KIEC-KONONOWICZ, EXPERT OPIN THER PATENTS, (2010), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1147 - 1169 | - RADDATZ ET AL., CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 10, pages 153 - 169 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329 | - STRAUSBERG RL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16899 - 16903 | - HILL SJ ET AL., "International Union of Pharmacology XIII. Classification of histamine receptors", PHARMACOL REV, (1997), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 253 - 278, XP000881903 | - LAITINEN JT; JOKINEN M, J NEUROCHEM, (1998), vol. 71, no. 2, pages 808 - 816 | - HUANG ET AL., J NEUROSCI, (2003), vol. 23, pages 5975 - 5983 | - HUANG ET AL., NAT NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 8, pages 858 - 859 |