|
03.08.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.02.2013 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
01.12.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.12.2012 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
01.12.2012 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
01.12.2012 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |