Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014357726 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | US201214361112 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012344297 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2785336 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B1 | EP2785336 | 08.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | EP12795340 | 29.11.2012 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014013227 | 13.06.2017 | A8 | BR112014013227 | 13.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2785336T | 11.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2551614T | 20.11.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2014006051 | 25.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 | WO2012EP04943 | 29.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013079211 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11191387 | 30.11.2011 | US201161564893 | 30.11.2011 |