EP2785336 - USE OF PEGYLATED ALCOHOLS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ACTINIC KERATOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARG, Heiko Siegfriedstr. 25 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
POOTH, Rainer Dachbergstr. 46A 65812 Bad Soden/Taunus / DE | 03 /
ABTS, Harry Frank Kurmainzer-Str. 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | 04 /
KIEHM, Kevin Bettina von Arnim Strasse 8 48291 Telgte / DE | [2014/46] |
Former [2014/41] | 01 /
BARG, Heiko Siegfriedstr. 25 69469 Weinheim / DE | ||
02 /
POOTH, Rainer Dachbergstr. 46A 65812 Bad Soden/Taunus / DE | |||
03 /
ABTS, Harry Frank Kurmainzer-Str. 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
04 /
KIEHM, Kevin Landgraf-Philipp-Str. 44 60431 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12795340.4 | 29.11.2012 | [2015/40] | WO2012EP04943 | Priority number, date | EP20110191387 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11191387 | US201161564893P | 30.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161564893 P | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013079211 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785336 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2785336 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/08, A61P17/00, A61P17/12 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/08 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PEGYLIERTEN ALKOHOLEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AKTINISCHER KERATOSE | [2014/41] | English: | USE OF PEGYLATED ALCOHOLS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ACTINIC KERATOSIS | [2014/41] | French: | UTILISATION D'ALCOOLS PÉGYLÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA KÉRATOSE ACTINIQUE | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 25.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Observations by third parties | 12.05.2015 | Observations by third parties | 14.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2012 | AL | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | MK | 30.09.2015 | MT | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | RS | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | SM | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | LU | 29.11.2015 | NO | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.11.2012 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.11.2012 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HU | 29.11.2012 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.11.2012 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010080345 (GRACEWAY PHARMACEUTICALS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0224] , [0268] *; | [A] - WILLIAM J MCINTYRE ET AL, "Treatment Options for Actinic Keratoses", vol. 76, no. 5, (2007), pages 667 - 671, American Family Physician, URL: http://www.aafp.org/afp/2007/0901/p667.html, (20120118), XP002667626 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - RIZZO A G ET AL, "Treatment of skin neoplasms with polidocanol infiltrations. Our experience (TRATTAMENTO DELLE NEOPLASIE CUTANEE CON INFILTRAZIONI DI POLIDOCANOLO. NOSTRA ESPERIENZA)", TUMORI, IT, (20050501), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 0300-8916, pages S197 - S198, XP008147715 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | other | - BUNDESINSTITUT FÜR RISIKOBEWERTUNG, "POLIDOCANOL IN KOSMETISCHEN MITTELN", STELLUNGNAHME DES BFR, (20031015), pages 1 - 5, XP003035771 | - CHEMISCHE FABRIK KREUSSLER & CO. GMBH, "POLIDOCANOL", (2012), pages 1 - 2, URL: HTTP://KREUSSLER-PHARMA.DE/ZUGANG-FUER-AERZTE-UND-APOTHEKER-FACHKREISE/PHLEBOLOGIE/2012-09-15-16-46-41/POLIDOCANOL.HTML, XP055198606 | - J. ALOS; ET AL, "EFFICACY AND SAFETY OF SCLEROTHERAPY USING POLIDOCANOL FOAM: A CONTROLLED CLINICAL TRIAL", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF VASCULAR AND ENDOVASCULAR SURGERY, (2006), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 101 - 107, XP005198558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejvs.2005.08.018 | - PARSI K; ET AL, "THE LYTIC EFFECTS OF DETERGENT SCLEROSANTS ON ERYTHROCYTES, PLATELETS,ENDOTHELIAL CELLS AND MICROPARTICLES ARE ATTENUATED BY ALBUMIN AND OTHER PLASMA COMPONENTS IN VITRO", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF VASCULAR AND ENDOVASCULAR SURGERY, (200808), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 216 - 223, XP022831575 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejvs.2008.03.001 | - K ORIKASA, "STUDIES ON THE DAMAGE OF THE CULTURED ENDOTHELIAL CELLS AND K-562 CELLS BY SCLEROSANTS (ETHANOLAMINE OLEATE, AETHOXYSKLEROL AND ABSOLUTE ETHANOL) USED IN THE TREATMENT OF ESOPHAGEAL VARICES", NIHON SHOKAKIBYO GAKKAI ZASSHI, (19891001), vol. 86, no. 10, pages 2365 - 2372, XP055198633 |