EP2908867 - METHOD OF DISINFECTING ONE OR MORE SURFACES AND/OR STERILIZING AIR, AND AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jimco A/S Mjølbyvej 7 5900 Rudkøbing / DK | [2016/52] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Kjølby - Research & Development A/S Mjølbyvej 7 5900 Rudkøbing / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Jimmy Kjølby Ahlefeldtsgade 31 DK-5900 Rudkøbing / DK | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [2015/35] | Application number, filing date | 12795746.2 | 19.10.2012 | [2015/35] | WO2012EP70820 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014060051 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908867 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2908867 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2908867 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, A61L2/20, A61L2/24, A61L9/015, A61L9/20 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
A61L2/202 (EP,US);
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
A61L9/015 (EP,US);
A61L9/04 (US);
A61L9/12 (US);
A61L9/20 (EP,US);
F24F8/22 (EP,US);
F24F8/26 (EP,US);
A61L2202/121 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,US);
A61L2202/16 (EP,US);
A61L2202/25 (EP,US);
A61L2209/111 (EP,US);
A61L2209/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | 18.05.2015 | ME | 18.05.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DESINFEKTION EINER ODER MEHRERER OBERFLÄCHEN UND/ODER ZUR STERILISATION VON LUFT SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DEM VERFAHREN | [2015/35] | English: | METHOD OF DISINFECTING ONE OR MORE SURFACES AND/OR STERILIZING AIR, AND AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN THE METHOD | [2015/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSINFECTION D'UNE OU PLUSIEURS SURFACES ET/OU DE STÉRILISATION DE L'AIR, ET APPAREIL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LE PROCÉDÉ | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 23.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2012 | AL | 21.12.2016 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
TR | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 21.12.2016 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004202570 (NADKARNI SHYAM K [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14-19,21,22,25 * abstract * [I] 20,23,24; | [XI]US2005123436 (CUMBERLAND JOHN R [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14-19,21,25 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] , [0037] , [0047] - [0049] - [0053] - [0058] - [0070] , [0072] , [0075] , [0076] , [0084] , [0092] , [0093] , [0101] - [0106] * * paragraphs [0110] , [0120] , [0121] , [0132] - [0134] - [0138] , [0145] , [0150] , [0158]; claim - * [I] 3,20,23,24; | [XI]US2005186108 (FIELDS WILLIAM MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14-19,21,25 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0017] - [0024] - [0030] - [0034] - [0049] - [0055]; figure -; claim - * [I] 5,13,20,23,24; | [XI]US2008310992 (HESELTON DOUGLAS [CA], et al) [X] 1,6-12,14,16-19,25 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0041] - [0047] - [0050] , [0051] , [0056] , [0058]; figure -; example -; claim - * [I] 3; | [I]US2009180934 (KHOSHBIN HOUSH [US]) [I] 1,2,6-12,14-21,23-25 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010178196 (GARNER CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US]) [I] 1-3,5-21,23-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006263276 | WO2006095199 |