Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2718265 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2718265



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 623
21.10.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.10.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.10.2015 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
22.10.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 71
22.10.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 71
12.10.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
07.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 9
07.10.2015 Description Search / examination 5
07.10.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
07.10.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 10
07.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
03.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 71
03.07.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 71
05.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
10.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 23
10.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
10.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
07.11.2014 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
22.10.2014 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
10.10.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.02.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
24.01.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
02.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 24
02.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
02.01.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.10.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67
13.12.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.12.2012 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 65