EP2718897 - OBJECT DIGITIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVERTT, Jeffrey Jesus c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Justin Avram c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
WILLOUGHBY, Christopher Harley c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SCAVEZZE, Mike c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
DEAGUERO, Joel c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
MARKOVIC, Relja c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
SOLA, Joe c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
HALEY, David c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2018/49] |
Former [2014/16] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12796475.7 | 05.06.2012 | [2018/49] | WO2012US40954 | Priority number, date | US201161493844P | 06.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161493844 P | US201213410907 | 02.03.2012 Original published format: US201213410907 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012170445 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718897 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2718897 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T15/00, H04N13/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G06T7/12 (EP,KR,US);
G06T15/08 (KR,US);
A63F13/213 (KR,US);
A63F13/53 (KR,US);
G06T19/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/50 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/268 (KR,US);
H04N13/271 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/2226 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1093 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/6018 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2200/08 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/10004 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | OBJEKTDIGITALISIERUNG | [2014/16] | English: | OBJECT DIGITIZATION | [2014/16] | French: | NUMÉRISATION D'OBJETS | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 15.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2012 | AL | 05.12.2018 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | MT | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | IE | 05.06.2019 | LU | 05.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6542249 (KOFMAN JONATHAN D [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 19-66 * * column 3, lines 35-43 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 44 * * column 9, lines 7-22,49-64 * * column 10, lines 18-29 * * column 14, lines 7-22,39-59 * * column 23, lines 10-22 *; | [I]US6750873 (BERNARDINI FAUSTO [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-11 * * column 2, lines 42-65 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 4 * * column 7, lines 12-27 * * column 10, lines 25-63 * * column 11, lines 12-25 * * column 13, lines 7-17 * * column 16, lines 20-27 *; | [A]US2007024620 (MULLER-FISCHER MATTHIAS H [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0007] , [0012] - [0015] - [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0057] , [0075] , [0076] *; | [I]US2010302247 (PEREZ KATHRYN STONE [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0019] , [0024] , [0028] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0097] , [0101] , [0102] , [0104] , [0105] * * paragraphs [0111] , [0113] , [0117] - [0119] - [0126] , [0130] * | International search | [A]US2007024620 (MULLER-FISCHER MATTHIAS H [CH], et al); | [A]US2007182739 (PLATONOV JURI [DE], et al); | [A]US2010085353 (ZHOU KUN [CN], et al); | [X]US2010302247 (PEREZ KATHRYN STONE [US], et al); | [A]KR20110013200 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US6750873 | US2010302247 |