EP2718486 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS OF PREDICTING ACTIVITY OF RETINOID X RECEPTOR MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denovo Biopharma (Hangzhou) Ltd. Co. 452 6th Avenue, Building 2 Room A1405-A1412 Hangzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Wen 5003 Ruette De Mer San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12797326.1 | 07.06.2012 | WO2012US41379 | Priority number, date | US201161494773P | 08.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161494773 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012170704 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718486 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C40B40/06, C12N15/12, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/70567 (EP,US);
G16C20/30 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (US);
C40B30/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER AKTIVITÄT DES RETINOID-X-REZEPTOR-MODULATORS | [2014/16] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS OF PREDICTING ACTIVITY OF RETINOID X RECEPTOR MODULATOR | [2014/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LA PRÉDICTION DE L'ACTIVITÉ D'UN MODULATEUR DU RÉCEPTEUR X DES RÉTINOÏDES | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 25.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2017 | 04.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/09] | 20.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - KOJIMA T ET AL, "Determination of genomic breakpoints in an epileptic patient using genotyping array", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 341, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2006.01.032, ISSN 0006-291X, (20060317), pages 792 - 796, (20060317), XP024923853 [X] 1-7,9 * page 792, right col.; abstract; * [I] 8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.01.032 | [XI] - J L MCCLAY ET AL, "Genome-wide pharmacogenomic analysis of response to treatment with antipsychotics", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (20090901), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1038/mp.2009.89, ISSN 1359-4184, pages 76 - 85, XP055153055 [X] 10,14 * abstract * * page 78, left; * [I] 11,12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mp.2009.89 | [A] - HAN J-Y ET AL, "Associations of ABCB1, ABCC2, and ABCG2 polymorphisms with irinotecan-pharmacokinetics and clinical outcome in patients with advanced non-small cell lung cancer", CANCER, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, vol. 110, no. 1, doi:10.1002/CNCR.22760, ISSN 0008-543X, (20070701), pages 138 - 147, (20070529), XP002688160 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.22760 | [A] - SHU-ZHEN WEI ET AL, "Predictive value of ERCC1 and XPD polymorphism in patients with advanced non-small cell lung cancer receiving platinum-based chemotherapy: a systematic review and meta-analysis", MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, (20100209), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s12032-010-9443-1, ISSN 1357-0560, pages 315 - 321, XP055153000 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12032-010-9443-1 | [XP] - LUO WEN ET AL, "Identification of polymorphisms associated with hypertriglyceridemia and prolonged survival induced by bexarotene in treating non-small cell lung cancer", ANTICANCER RESEARCH GREECE,, (20111201), vol. 31, no. 6, ISSN 1791-7530, pages 2303 - 2311, XP009159180 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2011056688 (CARIS LIFE SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2008280955 (MCCAMISH MARK A [US]); | [A] - ARDLIE K.G. ET AL., "Patterns of linkage disequilibrium in the human genome.", NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS, (2002), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 299 - 309, XP055137661 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg777 | Examination | - Affymetrix, "SNPs on the Affymetrix 500K array", (20060101), URL: www, (20161209), XP055327577 |