EP2719582 - SHOCK ABSORBER AND BUMPER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA Yutaka c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA Sunao c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | 03 /
OKADA Koshi c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | 04 /
FUKUNAGA Takuya c/o Nalco Iwai Co., Ltd. 3-9-39, Mikunihonmachi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5320005 / JP | 05 /
KUMAGAI Masaki c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | [2016/14] |
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
YAMADA Yutaka c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA Sunao c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | |||
03 /
OKADA Koshi c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUNAGA Takuya c/o Nalco Iwai Co., Ltd. 3-9-39, Mikunihonmachi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5320005 / JP | |||
05 /
KUMAGAI Masaki c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/16] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12797385.7 | 10.05.2012 | [2016/16] | WO2012JP61973 | Priority number, date | JP20110130377 | 10.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011130377 | JP20110194605 | 07.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011194605 | [2014/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012169310 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719582 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719582 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/34 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
B60R19/34 (EP,US);
B21D53/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFER UND STOSSFÄNGERVORRICHTUNG | [2014/16] | English: | SHOCK ABSORBER AND BUMPER DEVICE | [2014/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEUR ET PARE-CHOCS | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | Translation filed | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 10.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2012 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 10.05.2016 | LU | 10.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | GB | 20.07.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010002309 (GESTAMP HARDTECH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 2; figure - *; | [A]EP1762438 (WAGON AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0030]; figure - * | International search | [A]JPH05116645 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2006206000 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2009061845 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2008120324 (TOYOTOMI KIKO CO LTD); | [A]JP2002012105 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO); | [A]JP2001058550 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2000344029 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD, et al) | by applicant | JP2007030647 | JP2007261557 |