Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9193320 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | US2014125073 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP61973 | 10.05.2012 | JP2011194605 | 07.09.2011 | JP2011130377 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5970454B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B2 | JPWO2012169310 | 23.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP61973 | 10.05.2012 | JP2011194605 | 07.09.2011 | JP2011130377 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2719582 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | B1 | EP2719582 | 19.11.2014 | A4 | EP2719582 | 16.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP61973 | 10.05.2012 | JP2011194605 | 07.09.2011 | JP2011130377 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN203713779U | 16.07.2014 | U | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP61973 | 10.05.2012 | JP2011194605 | 07.09.2011 | JP2011130377 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012169310 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011194605 | 07.09.2011 | JP2011130377 | 10.06.2011 |