EP2717865 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING BRAIN CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Golden Biotechnology Corporation 15F, No.27-6, Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Rd. Danshuei New Taipei City / TW | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Sheng-Yung 15F, No. 27-6 Sec. 2 Jhong-Jheng E. Rd. Danshuei New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
HWANG, San-Bao 15F, No. 27-6 Sec. 2 Jhong-Jheng E. Rd. Danshuei NewTaipei City / TW | 03 /
WEN, Wu-Che 15F, No. 27-6 Sec. 2 Jhong-Jheng E. Rd. Danshuei New Taipei City / TW | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12797582.9 | 07.06.2012 | WO2012US41401 | Priority number, date | US201161495875P | 10.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161495875 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012170720 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2717865 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/517, C07C323/22, A61K31/122, A61K31/10, A61P35/00 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/122 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/12 (KR);
A61K31/19 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | A61K31/122, A61K31/12, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIRNKREBS | [2014/16] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING BRAIN CANCER | [2014/16] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU CERVEAU | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 28.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008260695 (LU KUNG-MING [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * Extracts of Anthrodia Camphorata for the treatment of cancers of different types, including brain cancer and neuroblastoma: see paragraph 7 last line, paragraph 26, claims and examples *; | [Y]US2007116787 (YAO CHIH-JUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Extracts of Anthrodia Camphorata for the treatment of brain cancer: see claims 1, 10 and paragraphs 27-28 *; | [Y]US7342137 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Antroquinonol, the preferred compound of the present application, for use in the treatment of different cancers, including breast, hepatic and prosate cancers: see column 2, lines 29-65; column 3, lines 5-15; examples, and claims *; | [Y] - Hsieh Wan-Yu et al, "Abstract #3676: Antroquinonol inhibits tumorgenesis and metastasis in highly invasive non-small-cell lung cancer cells", (20090421), 100th AACR Annual Meeting- Apr 18-22, 2009; Denver, CO, URL: http://www.aacrmeetingabstracts.org/cgi/content/meeting_abstract/2009/2_Annual_Meeting/3676?maxtoshow=&hits=10&RESULTFORMAT=&fulltext=Antrodia&andorexactfulltext=and&searchid=1&FIRSTINDEX=0&sortspec=relevance&resourcetype=HWCIT, (20140620), XP002726800 [Y] 1-15 * Antroquinonol inhibits cancer cell growth, cancer cell migration and invasion and selectively reduces cell survival signaling in the highly invasive lung adenocarcinoma cells. On the basis of this finding it is proposed as an anti-cancer drug for NSCLC treatment. * | [Y] - WATERHOUSE RIKKI N, "Determination of lipophilicity and its use as a predictor of blood-brain barrier penetration of molecular imaging agents.", MOLECULAR IMAGING AND BIOLOGY : MIB : THE OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE ACADEMY OF MOLECULAR IMAGING 2003 NOV-DEC, (200311), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 1536-1632, pages 376 - 389, XP002730385 [Y] 1-15 * Predicting the ability of molecules to cross the blood brain barrier * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mibio.2003.09.014 | [Y] - RANGEL-ORDÓÑEZ LAURA ET AL, "Plasma levels and distribution of flavonoids in rat brain after single and repeated doses of standardized Ginkgo biloba extract EGb 761(R).", PLANTA MEDICA OCT 2010, (201010), vol. 76, no. 15, ISSN 1439-0221, pages 1683 - 1690, XP002730386 [Y] 1-15 * Flavonoids from extracts of Ginko Biloba pass the Blood Brain Barrier * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0030-1249962 | International search | [A]US2011123562 (CHIANG BEEN-HUANG [TW], et al); | [A]US2011059123 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011059122 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011060059 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011060058 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011060057 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011060056 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011009494 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A]US2011009495 (LIU SHENG-YUN [TW], et al); | [A] - V. BHARATH KUMAR ET AL., "Antroquinonol inhibits NSCLC proliferation by alte ring PI3K/mTOR proteins and miRNA expression profiles.", MUTATION RESEARCH., (20110210), vol. 707, no. 1-2, pages 42 - 52, XP028134828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mrfmmm.2010.12.009 |