EP2788613 - INJECTION VALVE, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATCHETT, James 3900 Steeple Chase Apt. 2520 Farmington Hills, MI 48331-3418 / US | 02 /
HAEBERER, Rainer Eichenstrasse 32 75015 Bretten / DE | 03 /
KERST, Andreas 38000 Hills Tech Drive Farmington Hills, MI 48331-3418 / US | 04 /
KLINGER, Helko Xinhua Road Wuxi, 214028 / CN | 05 /
MEINGAST, Ulrich Im Wolfbusch 47B 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
SPAHIC, Elvis Humboldtstrasse 12 Top B15 5020 Salzburg / AT | 07 /
LILLICH, Julian Pestalozzistrasse 29 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 12797869.0 | 03.12.2012 | [2018/25] | WO2012EP74254 | Priority number, date | DE20111087954 | 08.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011087954 | [2014/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013083522 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2788613 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2788613 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/00 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
F02M55/004 (EP);
F02M55/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSPRITZVENTIL, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2014/42] | English: | INJECTION VALVE, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2014/42] | French: | INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT NOTAMMENT POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2012 | AL | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | DK | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | ES | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | MT | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | PT | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | RS | 20.06.2018 | SE | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | AT | 03.12.2018 | GB | 03.12.2018 | IE | 03.12.2018 | LU | 03.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 03.12.2012 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.12.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.12.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.12.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
GB | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3428597 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 4; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0238950 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [XY]JP2003049748 (KEIHIN CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * abstract * [Y] 9; | [Y]WO2004015263 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [XP]DE102011006500 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XP] 1,2,5,6,8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure 2 * * abstract * | by applicant | DE102009026532 |