EP2787908 - BONE CLAMPING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spineart SA Route de Pré-bois, 20 1217 Meyrin / CH | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVIEUX, Jérôme Chemin du maquis 38950 Saint Martin Le Vinoix / FR | 02 /
AMBLARD, Guillaume 17 rue de Vidollet CH-1215 Genève / CH | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/42] | 01 /
LEVIEUX, Jérôme 17 rue de Vidollet CH-1215 Genève / CH | ||
02 /
AMBLARD, Guillaume 17 rue de Vidollet CH-1215 Genève / CH | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12798295.7 | 07.12.2012 | WO2012EP74859 | Priority number, date | FR20110061386 | 09.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1161386 | [2014/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013083811 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2787908 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/7068 (EP,US);
A61B17/7047 (US);
F04C2270/0421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Title | German: | KNOCHENKLAMMERSYSTEM | [2014/42] | English: | BONE CLAMPING SYSTEM | [2014/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE PINCEMENT OSSEUX | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2008183218 (MUELLER RICH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046]; figures 9,10A,10B,11A * [Y] 7 [I] 5,10; | [YDA]US2008177391 (MITCHELL STEVEN T [US], et al) [YD] 7 * paragraph [0046]; figure 1E * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058]; figure 1G * [A] 1; | [XDI]US2011066186 (BOYER II MICHAEL LEE [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,9 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figures 6,7 * [I] 10; | [AD]US2008183211 (LAMBORNE ANDREW [US], et al) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0065]; figure 23 *; | [A]US2006247640 (BLACKWELL JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 6,13 * | by applicant | US2008183211 | US2011066186 | US2008177391 |