EP2794781 - INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sericol Limited Patricia Way Pysons Road Industrial Estate Broadstairs, Kent CT10 2LE / GB | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOULD, Nigel Patricia Way Pysons Road Industial Estate Broadstairs Kent CT10 2LE / GB | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Revell, Christopher, et al FUJIFILM Imaging Colorants Limited 6th Floor, Acresfield 8-10 Exchange Street Blackley Manchester M2 7HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Mayall, John Fujifilm Imaging Colorants Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon Tower, Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12799261.8 | 04.12.2012 | WO2012GB52997 | Priority number, date | GB20110022030 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: GB 201122030 | GB20120002831 | 20.02.2012 Original published format: GB 201202831 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013093414 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2794781 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D11/10 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | TINTEN | [2014/44] | English: | INKS | [2014/44] | French: | ENCRES | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Fujifilm Speciality Ink Systems Limited Pysons Road Industrial Estate Patricia Way Broadstairs, Kent CT10 2LE / GB | Date: | 02.12.2015 | [2016/11] | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007071328 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,10,12-15 * page 1, lines 1-19; example 13; claims 1-13; tables 1,2 * [I] 2,8,11,16-18 | Examination | WO2011021052 | by applicant | WO2011021052 | WO02085832 | US4987159 |