15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
26.03.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
17.04.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
10.04.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
15.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.01.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
13.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
13.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
28.08.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
10.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
15.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
15.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|