EP2719665 - IMPREGNATED CALCIUM CARBONATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, POLYMER COMPOSITION, AND POLYMER PRECURSOR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiraishi Kogyo Kaisha, Ltd. 1-4, Kitahama 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Yu c/o SHIRAISHI CENTRAL LABORATORIES CO. LTD. 78 Motohama-cho 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0085 / JP | 02 /
KAYANO, Yoshisada c/o SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD. 78 Motohama-cho 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0085 / JP | 03 /
OSAKABE, Kanehiro c/o SHIRAISHI CENTRAL LABORATORIES CO. LTD. 78 Motohama-cho 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0085 / JP | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12799794.8 | 12.06.2012 | WO2012JP65009 | Priority number, date | JP20110131113 | 13.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011131113 | [2014/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012173114 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719665 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/18, C08K9/04, C08L101/00, B82Y30/00, C09C1/02, // C08K3/26, C08K5/00, C08K5/09, C08L71/02 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
C08K9/04 (EP,KR,US);
C01F11/18 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/04, C08L101/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | C01F11/18, C08K9/04, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | IMPRÄGNIERTES CALCIUMCARBONAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND POLYMERVORLÄUFERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2014/16] | English: | IMPREGNATED CALCIUM CARBONATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, POLYMER COMPOSITION, AND POLYMER PRECURSOR COMPOSITION | [2014/16] | French: | CARBONATE DE CALCIUM IMPRÉGNÉ, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE ET COMPOSITION PRÉCURSEUR DE POLYMÈRE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2013 | Translation filed | 12.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 11.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1557442 (SOLVAY [BE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0017] , [0020] *; | [X]EP2080783 (SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0014] , [0018] - [0021] - [0025] , [0038] - [0042] *; | [X]EP1785452 (SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0056] *; | [X]US2002102404 (NAKAI GO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0064] - [0084] - [0089] *; | [X]JP2002235015 (SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2007520599 (SOLVAY); | [Y]JP2002235015 (SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD); | [A]JPH0431318 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]JP2001072890 (MARUO CALCIUM); | [A]JP2010228976 (SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD) | by applicant | JP2010228976 |