EP2720707 - ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResoTher Pharma ApS "Næsseslottet" Dronninggårds Alle 136 2840 Holte / DK | [2017/11] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Enteris BioPharma, Inc. 83 Fulton Street Boonton, NJ 07005 / US | ||
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states UGP Therapeutics, Inc. 227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3900 Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONSALVO, Angelo, P. 105 Fredrick Drive Monroe, NY 10950 / US | 02 /
MEHTA, Nozer, M. 14 Old Coach Road Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | 03 /
PERRETTI, Mauro 203 Goldhurst Terrace London NW6 3ER / GB | 04 /
DALLI, Jesmond 369 Tappan Street Apt. 10 Brookline, MA 02445 / US | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/51] |
Former [2014/17] | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12799815.1 | 15.06.2012 | [2018/51] | WO2012US42699 | Priority number, date | US201161497270P | 15.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161497270 P | US201213524381 | 15.06.2012 Original published format: US201213524381 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012174397 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2720707 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2720707 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
C07K14/4721 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/4703 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRODUKTE | [2014/17] | English: | ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS | [2014/17] | French: | PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 30.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18212844.7 / EP3533457 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | LU | 15.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006039621 (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2B *[I] 2-4,12-15 | International search | [Y]WO2008121881 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al); | [Y]US2009163578 (DOROVKOV MAXIM V [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010043045 (LONDON HEALTH SCI CT RES INC [CA], et al); | [Y] - HU ET AL., "Membrane-Induced Folding and Structure of Membrane-Bound Annexin A1 N-Terminal peptides: Implications for Annexin-Induced Membrane Aggregation", BIOPHYS. J., (200803), vol. 94, pages 1773 - 1781, XP055135709 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1529/biophysj.107.119685 | [A] - ZHANG ET AL., "Annexin 1 induced by anti-inflammatory drugs binds to NF-kappaB and inhibits its activation: anticancer effects in vitro and in vivo", CANCER RES., (20100315), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 2379 - 2388, XP055135710 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-09-4204 | by applicant | US4708934 | EP0308067 | EP0382403 | US6086018 | US6103495 | US2006292672 | US7445911 | US2009317462 | - Biotechnology, (19930000), vol. 11, pages 64 - 70 | - RAY et al., Protein Expression and Purification, (20020000), vol. 26, pages 249 - 259 | - MEHTA, Biopharm. International, (20040700), pages 44 - 46 |