EP2721555 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING MULTIPLE IMAGES OF A SAME SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tandent Computer Vision, LLC 999 Brannan Street Penthouse Suite San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Tandent Vision Science, Inc. 505 Montgomery Street San Francisco, California 94111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Casey, Arthur 2013 Overlook Dr Grand Junction, CO 81505 / US | 02 /
STEIN, Andrew, Neil 35 Yoder St. Pittsburgh, PA 15207 / US | 03 /
MAXWELL, Bruce, Allen 44 Denico Lane Benton, ME 04901-3634 / US | 04 /
FRIEDHOFF, Richard, Mark c/o Tandent Vision Science Inc. 505 Montgomery Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Prüfeninger Straße 21 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/17] | Reichert, Werner Franz Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12800142.7 | 18.05.2012 | WO2012US38604 | Priority number, date | US201113162192 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: US201113162192 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012173743 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721555 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
G06V10/60 (EP,US);
G06V20/30 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEHRERER BILDER EINER EINZIGEN SZENE | [2014/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING MULTIPLE IMAGES OF A SAME SCENE | [2014/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER PLUSIEURS IMAGES D'UNE MÊME SCÈNE | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 02.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2020 | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/42] | 05.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/42] | 17.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7433540 (SCHUSTER MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 23 *; | [X] - WEISS Y ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Deriving intrinsic images from image sequences", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHT IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION. (ICCV). VANCOUVER, BRITISH COLUMBIA, CANADA, JULY 7 - 14, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20010707), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ICCV.2001.937606, ISBN 978-0-7695-1143-6, pages 68 - 75, XP010554070 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2001.937606 | [A] - Harry G. Barrow ET AL, "Recovering intrinsic scene characteristics from images", Research report - Artificial Intelligence Center, SRI International, (19780101), URL: http://www.ai.sri.com/pubs/files/737.pdf, (20120103), XP055015607 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002191833 (KIM MYOUNG-JIN [KR]); | [A]US6563959 (TROYANKER VLAD [US]); | [Y]US2004151365 (AN CHANG NELSON LIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2010111370 (BLACK MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [X]US2011064263 (DE HAAN MATTHIAS M [US], et al) | by applicant | US2010142805 | US2010142825 | - HARRIS; STEPHENS, "A combined corner and edge detector", Proceedings of the 4th Alvey Vision Conference, (19880000), pages 147 - 151 |