EP2706938 - RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION CATHETER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tidal Wave Technology, Inc. 5597 St. Joseph Fairway Memphis, TN 38120 / US | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIMMELSTEIN, Steven 5670 Vantage Point Memphis, TN 38120 / US | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12800580.8 | 15.06.2012 | WO2012US42664 | Priority number, date | US201161497366P | 15.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161497366 P | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012174375 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706938 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61B2017/00867 (EP);
A61B2018/00023 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (EP);
A61B2018/00285 (EP);
A61B2018/00375 (EP);
A61B2018/00404 (EP);
A61B2018/00434 (EP);
A61B2018/00511 (EP);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00702 (EP);
A61B2018/00732 (EP);
A61B2018/00761 (EP);
A61B2018/00815 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | KATHETERVORRICHTUNG ZUR ABLATION MITTELS HOCHFREQUENZ | [2014/12] | English: | RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION CATHETER DEVICE | [2014/12] | French: | CATHÉTER D'ABLATION PAR RADIOFRÉQUENCE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008275445 (KELLY DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0112] - [0117] - [0130] , [0142] * [I] 2-15; | [X]WO2011056684 (INNOVATIVE PULMONARY SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 26, lines 14-21 * * page 36, line 7 - page 37, line 5 *; | [X]US2005165388 (BHOLA SUMITA [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0074] , [0081] , [0082] , [0094] *; | [A]US2004215186 (CORNELIUS RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003074039 (PUSKAS JOHN D [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009306644 (MAYSE MARTIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007129720 (DEMARAIS DENISE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004215180 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003069620 (LI HONG [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2005165388 (BHOLA); | [Y]US2004215186 (CORNELIUS ET AL); | [Y]US2003074039 (PUSKAS) | Examination | US6315778 | US2008086073 | US2002165535 | WO2010001404 |