EP2720310 - BATTERY PACK HAVING IMPROVED UNIFORMITY IN DISTRIBUTION OF REFRIGERANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/38] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Chae Ho A-542 Dtvan Officetel Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, JiYoung 431-202 Hyundai Hometown 4-cha 3-danji Apt. Jukjeon 1-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-972 / KR | 03 /
LEE, BumHyun 64-1 Myeongnyun-dong 4-ga Jongno-gu Seoul 110-524 / KR | 04 /
PARK, WonChan A-847 Dtvan Officetel Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, YongSeok 505-801 Sindong-a Pamillie Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-745 / KR | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12800922.2 | 04.06.2012 | WO2012KR04402 | Priority number, date | KR20110056651 | 13.06.2011 Original published format: KR 20110056651 | [2014/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012173351 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2720310 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/60, F25D17/00, B60K11/00, B60L11/18, H01M2/02 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/6563 (EP,KR,US);
B60K1/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M10/663 (KR);
H01M50/211 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60K11/06 (EP,US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | H01M10/50, F25D17/00, B60K11/00, B60L11/18, H01M2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK MIT VERBESSERTER GLEICHMÄSSIGKEIT BEI DER VERTEILUNG EINES KÜHLMITTELS | [2014/16] | English: | BATTERY PACK HAVING IMPROVED UNIFORMITY IN DISTRIBUTION OF REFRIGERANT | [2014/16] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE AYANT UNE UNIFORMITÉ AMÉLIORÉE DANS LA DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2013 | Translation filed | 29.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 13.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/17] | 15.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5589290 (KLINK RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-22 * line 44 - column 6, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009305124 (AHN JAESUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010067944 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010109293 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20050007648 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]KR20050070727 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20070006952 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) |