EP2721884 - LOCATION-AIDED RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDAU, Varsha c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA-International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SINHA, Sudipta c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA-International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ZITNICK, Charles Lawrence c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA-International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SZELISKI, Richard c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA-International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12801011.3 | 13.06.2012 | WO2012US42106 | Priority number, date | US201113162591 | 17.06.2011 Original published format: US201113162591 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012174024 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721884 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
G06V10/87 (EP,US);
G06F18/285 (EP,KR,US);
G06F18/2115 (EP,KR,US);
G06V2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | ORTSGESTÜTZTE ERKENNUNG | [2014/17] | English: | LOCATION-AIDED RECOGNITION | [2014/17] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE ASSISTÉE DE LOCALISATION | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2017 | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/44] | 20.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.06.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US2011150324 (NGAN KING NGI [HK], et al) [XP] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XI] - HOASHI K ET AL, "Constructing a landmark identification system for Geo-tagged photographs based on Web data analysis", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2009. ICME 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090628), ISBN 978-1-4244-4290-4, pages 606 - 609, XP031510825 [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * Sections 3.1, 3.2, 3.4, and 4.2 * [I] 2 | [XI] - WEI GUAN ET AL, "GPS-aided recognition-based user tracking system with augmented reality in extreme large-scale areas", MMSYS '11 PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND ANNUAL ACM CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS, New York, NY, USA, (20110223), vol. 25, doi:10.1145/1943552.1943554, ISBN 978-1-45-030518-1, page 1, XP055169605 [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * sections 3, 5, and 7.1 * [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1943552.1943554 | [A] - KEITA YAEGASHI ET AL, Can Geotags Help Image Recognition?, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; VOL. 5414; PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD PACIFIC RIM SYMPOSIUM ON ADVANCES IN IMAGE AND VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 361 - 373, (20090113), ISBN 978-3-540-92956-7, XP019137244 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * Sections 1 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-92957-4_32 | [A] - MICHAEL CALONDER ET AL, BRIEF: Binary Robust Independent Elementary Features, COMPUTER VISION - ECCV 2010, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 778 - 792, (20100905), ISBN 978-3-642-15560-4, XP019150781 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * Sections 1 and 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-15561-1_56 | [XL] - VARSHA HEDAU ET AL, A Memory Efficient Discriminative Approach for Location Aided Recognition, COMPUTER VISION ECCV 2012. WORKSHOPS AND DEMONSTRATIONS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 187 - 197, (20121007), ISBN 978-3-642-33862-5, XP047018806 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [L] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-33863-2_19 | International search | [Y]US2005271352 (YOKOUCHI KOUJI [JP]); | [A]US2007115373 (GALLAGHER ANDREW C [US], et al); | [Y]US2011091112 (ENGTROEM JIMMY [SE], et al) |