EP2725796 - IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE ENCODING/DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Velos Media International Limited Unit 32, the Hyde Building The Park, Carrickmines Dublin 18 / IE | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAI, Hisao c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SHIBAHARA, Youji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
TANIKAWA, Kyoko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-627 / JP | 06 /
MATSUNOBU, Toru c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12802237.3 | 21.06.2012 | WO2012JP04014 | Priority number, date | US201161500805P | 24.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161500805 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012176450 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725796 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40, H04N19/13, H04N19/169, H04N19/70, H04N19/436, H04N19/51 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/521 (US);
H04N19/184 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/1887 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/436 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDCODIERUNGS-/-DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/18] | English: | IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE ENCODING/DECODING DEVICE | [2014/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGES, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGES, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGES ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE/DÉCODAGE D'IMAGES | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | Translation filed | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 23.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 05.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP17204482.8 / EP3309969 | EP17204497.6 / EP3309970 | EP19158039.8 / EP3522377 | EP23168445.7 / EP4220966 | EP24172404.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5381145 (ALLEN JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]GB2319689 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [A]US2011080954 (BOSSEN FRANK J [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2008211697 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2010278668 (SONY CORP); | [A]WO2011034148 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); |