EP2722100 - REVERSE OSMOSIS MEMBRANE HAVING SUPERIOR SALT REJECTION AND PERMEATE FLOW, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/38] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-875 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Phill 704-1605 Banseok maeul 7 Danji Apt. Banseok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-750 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Chong-Kyu 18-9 Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-358 / KR | 03 /
YOO, Joung-Eun 1820 Magnolia 939 Dunsan 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-828 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Seung-Pyo 304-305 Sungwon Apt. Taejeon-dong Gwangju-si Gyeonggi-do 464-712 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Young-Ju 105-1703 Chimsan Chonggu Apt. 431-2 Chimsan-dong Buk-gu Daegu 702-050 / KR | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12802905.5 | 19.06.2012 | WO2012KR04843 | Priority number, date | KR20110059810 | 20.06.2011 Original published format: KR 20110059810 | KR20120065694 | 19.06.2012 Original published format: KR 20120065694 | [2014/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012177033 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2722100 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/10, B01D69/12, B01D61/02, B01D71/56, B01D71/02 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0079 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0002 (US);
B01D67/0006 (KR);
B01D67/00793 (KR);
B01D69/107 (KR);
B01D69/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/1213 (KR);
B01D69/1251 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/148 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/0211 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | UMKEHROSMOSEMEMBRAN MIT HERVORRAGENDEN SALZUNTERDRÜCKUNGS- UND PERMEATFLUSSEIGENSCHAFTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/17] | English: | REVERSE OSMOSIS MEMBRANE HAVING SUPERIOR SALT REJECTION AND PERMEATE FLOW, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2014/17] | French: | MEMBRANE D'OSMOSE INVERSE PRÉSENTANT UN REJET DES SELS ET UN FLUX DE PERMÉAT SUPÉRIEURS, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRIQUER | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | Translation filed | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 09.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009078640 (CHU BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [X]US2010025330 (RATTO TIMOTHY V [US], et al); | International search | [A]KR100477587B ; | [A]KR100583136B ; | [Y]KR100680109B ; | [A]KR100781625B (SAEHAN IND INC [KR]); | [X]US2008149561 (CHU BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [A]US2010062156 (KURTH CHRISTOPHER JAMES [US], et al) |