EP2723375 - MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING IMMUNE RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32641 / US | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSERFALL, Clive Henry 1928 SW 36th Place Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | 02 /
ATKINSON, Mark A. 7456 SW 116th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | 03 /
KESELOWSKY, Benjamin George 4359 NW 35th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32605 / US | 04 /
YOON, Young Mee 281 Corry VLG, APT10 Gainesville, FL 32603 / US | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/18] | 01 /
WASSERFALL, Clive Henry 1928 SW 36th Place Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | ||
02 /
ATKINSON, Mark A. 7456 SW 116th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | |||
03 /
KESELOWSKY, Benjamin George 4359 NW 35th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32605 / US | |||
04 /
YOON, Young Mee 5008 NW 44th Lane Apt. 103 Gainesville, FL 32606 / US | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12803033.5 | 25.06.2012 | WO2012US43993 | Priority number, date | US201161500445P | 23.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161500445 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012178160 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2723375 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K38/19, A61K38/17, A61K39/35, A61P37/00, A61P29/00, A61K39/00 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
A61K39/0005 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61K38/193 (EP,US);
A61K39/35 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | A61K39/39, A61K38/19, A61K38/17, A61K39/35, A61P37/00, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION VON IMMUNSYSTEMREAKTIONEN | [2014/18] | English: | MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING IMMUNE RESPONSES | [2014/18] | French: | MATÉRIAUX ET PROCÉDÉS DE MODULATION DE RÉACTIONS IMMUNITAIRES | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 09.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003003133 (SCHNEIDER HEINZ [CH]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document, especially the abstract, paragraphs [0057], [0066], [0071] and [0084]. *; | [X]WO2010132867 (IRX THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract, claims paragraphs [000110], [000149] *; | [XYI]WO2011014871 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document, especially abstract, page 3, lines 16-22, bridging paragraph on pages 23-24, claims 1-19 * [Y] 12-16 [I] 4; | [Y] - BENJAMIN G. KESELOWSKY ET AL, "Multifunctional dendritic cell-targeting polymeric microparticles: Engineering new vaccines for type 1 diabetes", HUMAN VACCINES, (20110101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.4161/hv.7.1.12916, ISSN 1554-8600, pages 37 - 44, XP055106806 [Y] 12-16 * abstract, page 38, left-hand column, first full paragraph - right-hand column, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/hv.7.1.12916 | International search | [Y]WO2007063421 (TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN [IE], et al); | [Y] - HO-YUAN CHOU ET AL., "Hydrogel-delivered GM-CSF overcomes nonresponsiveness to hepatitis B vaccine through the recruitment and activation of dendritic cells", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 185, no. 9, pages 5468 - 5475, XP055140174 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1001875 | [A] - BENJAMIN G. KESELOWSKY ET AL., "Multifunctional dendritic cell-targeting polymeric microparticles: Engineering new vaccines for type 1 diabetes", HUMAN VACCINES, (201101), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 37 - 44, XP055106806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/hv.7.1.12916 | [XP] - YOUNG MEE YOON ET AL., "Development of a tolerogenic matrix containing autoantigens for the prevention of type 1 diabetes", DIABETES, (201107), vol. 60, no. SUPPL., pages A668 - A669, XP055140179 |