01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
21.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
01.06.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.12.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
10.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
26.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
16.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
20.06.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
21.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
19.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|