EP2724232 - RESOURCE MANAGEMENT FOR CLOUD COMPUTING PLATFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Navendu c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
MENACHE, Ishai c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 12803686.0 | 13.06.2012 | WO2012US42110 | Priority number, date | US201113169890 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US201113169890 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013003031 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724232 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/04, G06F9/50, G06F9/44 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06F9/5072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | G06F9/50, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENVERWALTUNG FÜR CLOUD-COMPUTING-PLATTFORMEN | [2014/18] | English: | RESOURCE MANAGEMENT FOR CLOUD COMPUTING PLATFORMS | [2014/18] | French: | GESTION DE RESSOURCES POUR PLATEFORMES D'INFORMATIQUE EN NUAGE | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010088205 (ROBERTSON JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X]US2009279444 (RAVINDRAN RAVISHANKAR [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0059] * * abstract *; | [X]US2010319004 (HUDSON WILLIAM HUNTER [US] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0055] * * abstract *; | [X]US2010332401 (PRAHLAD ANAND [IN] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2011131309 (AKIYAMA KAZUHITO ET AL.); | [A]JP2007249470 (NEC BIGLOBE LTD.); | [A]JP2003162591 (NEC CORP.); | [A]US2010319004 (HUDSON WILLIAM HUNTER ET AL.) |