EP2724058 - BRAZED TURBINE SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turbine Services Ltd. 41 Old Gick Road Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 / US | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGGI, Vincent, T. Jr. 268 Broadway Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 / US | 02 /
MONSHOWER, Barry 33 Merrall Drive Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
HYSLOP, Justin, D. 6 Mallards Landing N Waterford, NY 12188 / US | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Szynka, Dirk König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Szynka, Dirk König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12803857.7 | 26.06.2012 | WO2012US44137 | Priority number, date | US201113169253 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US201113169253 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013003311 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724058 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23K101/00, B23K101/22, B23K103/18, B23K15/06, B23K15/00, F01D9/02, F01D11/00, F02C7/28, F16J15/08 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
F01D11/005 (EP,US);
B23K15/006 (EP,US);
B23K15/0093 (EP,US);
F01D9/023 (EP,US);
F02C7/28 (EP,US);
F16J15/0812 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2101/22 (EP,US);
B23K2103/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | F16J15/08, B23K15/00, F01D11/00, F02C7/28, F01D9/02 | ||
Former IPC [2014/18] | F16J15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | GELÖTETE TURBINENDICHTUNG | [2014/18] | English: | BRAZED TURBINE SEAL | [2014/18] | French: | JOINT DE TURBINE BRASÉ | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 06.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5934687 (BAGEPALLI BHARAT SAMPATHKUMARA [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003133793 (VEDANTAM SRIKANTH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3489534 (LEVINSTEIN MOSES A); | [Y]US5624227 (FARRELL THOMAS R [US]); | [Y]US3061912 (KALIL EMIL O) | by applicant | US5934687 |