EP2725925 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NATURAL CRYSTALLINE COLORANT AND RELATED PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/19] | NATURAL CRYSTALLINE COLORANT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION | ||
[2021/08] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. & J. Gallo Winery 600 Yosemite Boulevard Modesto, CA 95354 / US | [2021/31] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states E. & J. Gallo Winery 600 Yosemite Boulevard Modesto, Ca 95354 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSSI, Joseph 4884 West Bluff Ave Fresno, CA 93722 / US | 02 /
KATTAMURI, Sundeep Plot No. 48 Navaniman Nagar Jubilee Hill Road No. 71 Hyderabad 500033 / IN | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | sgb europe Lechnerstraße 25a 82067 Ebenhausen / DE | ||
Former [2014/19] | Grubert, Andreas King & Spalding 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12804773.5 | 28.06.2012 | [2021/31] | WO2012US44687 | Priority number, date | US201161503557P | 30.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161503557 P | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013003616 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725925 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2725925 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09B61/00, A23L5/44, A23L5/42, A23L5/46, B01D15/08, C08K5/1545, C08K5/3417, C08K5/132 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C08K5/3417 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/97 (CN);
A23L5/42 (EP,BR,US);
A23L5/43 (CN);
A23L5/44 (EP,BR,US);
A23L5/46 (EP,BR,US);
A61K47/46 (CN);
A61Q19/00 (CN);
B01D1/065 (BR,US);
B01D11/0403 (BR,US);
B01D11/0492 (BR,US);
B01D15/08 (EP,BR,US);
B01D3/001 (BR,US);
B01D61/145 (BR,US);
B01D61/58 (BR,US);
B01D63/10 (EP,BR,CN,US);
B01D71/68 (BR,US);
B01D9/0031 (BR,US);
C08K5/132 (EP,BR,US);
C08K5/1545 (EP,BR,US);
C09B61/00 (EP,BR,CN,US);
C09B67/0033 (CN);
C09B67/0096 (CN);
C12P7/06 (BR,US);
A23V2002/00 (BR,CN,US);
A61K2800/10 (CN);
B01D2315/16 (BR,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/044 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/044, A23V2250/202, A23V2250/21, A23V2250/2104, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/2112 (CN) |
Former IPC [2015/24] | A23L1/00, C09B61/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/19] | A23L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG NATÜRLICHEN KRISTALLFARBSTOFFS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/09] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NATURAL CRYSTALLINE COLORANT AND RELATED PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COLORANT CRISTALLIN NATUREL ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2021/09] |
Former [2014/19] | NATÜRLICHER KRISTALLFARBSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2014/19] | NATURAL CRYSTALLINE COLORANT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION | ||
Former [2014/19] | COLORANT CRISTALLIN NATUREL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2020 | 07.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18154792.8 / EP3351596 | EP18154793.6 / EP3369783 | EP21189535.4 / EP3936574 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.2022
25.04.2022
ADMISSIBLE Oterra A/S Agern Alle 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Willnegger, Eva, et al, et al Montgomery IP Boulevard Saint Michel 10/4 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [2022/22] | 19.05.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 08.02.2024 | Appeal received No. T0209/24 | 08.02.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 08.04.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 24.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2012 | AL | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | LU | 28.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 04.08.2021 | |
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 04.08.2021 | |
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 04.08.2021 | |
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 04.08.2021 | |
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2399467 (VERNIERS SA [FR]); | [X]WO03079816 (INDENA SPA [IT], et al) | International search | [Y]US1988031 (BARNETT HAROLD M); | [Y]US2003041780 (ISAGER PER PIHLMANN [US], et al); | [Y]US2005181101 (HARADA KOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2007110857 (HARTAL DOV [IL], et al); | [Y]US2008075824 (BIEHL HEATHER L [US]); | [Y]US2009226589 (FERREIRA EBER LOPES [BR]); | [Y]US2009246315 (BARNEKOW RAINER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010145116 (VAN KEULEN FREDERIK [PT], et al) | Examination | US4500556 | WO2007039452 | Opposition | WO2012009469 | US2012076904 | WO2013003616 | EP2725925 |