EP2724383 - SOLAR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jost, Alfred 1918 North Forest Mesa, Arizona 85203 / US | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12805063.0 | 21.06.2012 | WO2012US43618 | Priority number, date | US201161501211P | 25.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161501211 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013003204 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724383 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042, H01L31/052 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H01L31/0543 (EP,US);
H02S40/22 (KR);
H01L31/18 (US);
H01L31/0549 (EP,US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | SOLARMODUL | [2014/18] | English: | SOLAR MODULE | [2014/18] | French: | MODULE SOLAIRE | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5517339 (RICCOBONO JUANITA R [US], et al) [X] 1,15,16* column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 24; figure 3 *; | [I]DE102007023583 (SOLARTEC AG [DE]) [I] 1-11,14 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1, 2, * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0081] *; | [I]DE102008010012 (SOLARTEC AG [DE]) [I] 1,3-14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1, 2 *; | [I]WO2008145111 (SOLARTEC AG [DE], et al) [I] 1,3-6 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 18; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2003501606 (LEONHARD KURZ GMBH & CO.); | [Y]JP2007218540 (UNIV NAGAOKA TECHNOLOGY, et al); | [A]KR20100060912 (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]); | [X]KR20110048406 (LG INNOTEK CO., LTD.) |