EP2795725 - PATCH ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBRIC, Nikola Am Klostergarten 1 81241 München / DE | 02 /
HUBER, Alois Irsham 55 94081 Fürstenzell / DE | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12805428.5 | 06.12.2012 | WO2012EP05037 | Priority number, date | DE201110122039 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011122039 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013091785 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2795725 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04, H01Q5/00, H01Q1/32, H01Q21/30 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0428 (EP,US);
H01Q21/00 (US);
H01Q1/3275 (EP,US);
H01Q19/005 (US);
H01Q21/30 (EP,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP,US);
H01Q5/385 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0414 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0435 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0464 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATCH-ANTENNEN-ANORDNUNG | [2014/44] | English: | PATCH ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT | [2014/44] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE PATCH | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 19.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003160728 (FUKUSHIMA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-26* paragraphs [0017] , [0094] , [0095] , [0124] , [0125]; figures 7,17 *; | [XYI]JP2006121219 (HARADA IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-13,15-20,22,24 * the whole document * [Y] 1-7,9-26 [I] 3,7,8,14,21,23,25,26; | [XYI]US2006273961 (DUZDAR AYMAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-13,15-20,22,24 * the whole document * [Y] 1-7,9-26 [I] 3,7,8,14,21,23,25,26; | [Y]DE102006027694 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-24 * paragraphs [0003] , [0045] - [0059]; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]DE102006038528 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-24 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003052825 | EP1616367 | US7253770 | US7405700 | US2009058731 | DE102004016158 | US2010171679 | US2010283684 |