EP2839146 - WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieser, Gudrun Droissendorf 15 4521 Schiedlberg / AT | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESER, Gerhard Droissendorf 15 A-4521 Schiedlberg / AT | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 12805907.8 | 16.11.2012 | [2017/25] | WO2012AT50179 | Priority number, date | AT20110001709 | 17.11.2011 Original published format: AT 17092011 | [2015/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013071328 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839146 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839146 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/02, F03D1/06, F03D1/04 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
F03D1/04 (EP,CN,US);
F03D1/02 (US);
F03D1/0608 (EP,CN,US);
F03D7/0244 (US);
F03D7/04 (US);
F03D80/40 (US);
F03D80/60 (US);
F03D9/25 (US);
F05B2240/33 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | F03D1/04, F03D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Title | German: | WINDKRAFTANLAGE | [2015/09] | English: | WIND TURBINE | [2015/09] | French: | ÉOLIENNE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/09] | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2015/09] | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 08.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2015 | Decision despatched | 06.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees PL, FR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 08.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 08.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2016 | 30.11.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | MT | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/47] | CY | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | LT | 21.06.2017 | |
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | LT | 21.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2010131052 (KINETIC HARVEST LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 6-10 [I] 11-13; | [X]WO2010108196 (BERSIEK SHAMEL A [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0088]; figures 17-21 *; | [X]US2011103955 (DESAULNIERS JERRY [CA]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]DE804090 (PAUL DUEMMEL) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 59 - line 65; figure - *; | [Y]DE2949447 (VOITH GETRIEBE KG) [Y] 7 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2010316487 (PRESZ JR WALTER M [US]) [Y] 6,10 * paragraph [0086] *; | [Y]US2011037268 (SAMMY JOHANN QUINCY [US]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0036]; figures 1c,3a * | by applicant | WO02057625 | EP1415089 |