Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9644756 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2017 | B2 | US2014305520 | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | WO2012EP74933 | 10.12.2012 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 | US201214362342 | 10.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102018404B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | B1 | KR20140098854 | 08.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | WO2012EP74933 | 10.12.2012 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6112315B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B2 | JP2015500447 | 05.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | WO2012EP74933 | 10.12.2012 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103988005B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B | CN103988005 | 13.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | WO2012EP74933 | 10.12.2012 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2788641 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | B1 | EP2788641 | 15.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | WO2012EP74933 | 10.12.2012 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2788641T | 01.02.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | WO2012EP74933 | 10.12.2012 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013083832 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161568848 | 09.12.2011 | DKPA201170694 | 09.12.2011 |