Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9237622 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2016 | B2 | US2014361700 | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP76661 | 21.12.2012 | EP11195938 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6312601B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B2 | JP2015513756 | 14.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP76661 | 21.12.2012 | EP11195938 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104025718B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | B | CN104025718 | 03.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP76661 | 21.12.2012 | EP11195938 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2798919 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2020 | B1 | EP2798919 | 05.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12806497 | 21.12.2012 | WO2012EP76661 | 21.12.2012 | EP11195938 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013098239 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11195938 | 28.12.2011 |