EP2729916 - MOTION COMPENSATION IN RANGE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Streeter, Lee Vincent Level 12 KPMG Centre 85 Alexandra Street Hamilton 3204 / NZ | For all designated states Dorrington, Adrian Andrew Level 12 KPMG Centre 85 Alexandra Street Hamilton 3204 / NZ | For all designated states Payne, Andrew Dean Level 12 KPMG Centre 85 Alexandra Street Hamilton 3204 / NZ | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 12807707.0 | 03.07.2012 | WO2012NZ00117 | Priority number, date | US201161504244P | 04.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161504244 P | US201161528655P | 29.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161528655 P | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013006067 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729916 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G01S17/36 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
G01S17/36 (EP,US);
H04N23/6811 (US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSAUSGLEICH IN EINER BEREICHSBILDGEBUNG | [2014/20] | English: | MOTION COMPENSATION IN RANGE IMAGING | [2014/20] | French: | COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT DANS UNE IMAGERIE DE DISTANCE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 02.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2014 | 31.07.2023 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005111697 (YAMAMOTO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A] - Marvin Lindner ET AL, "Compensation of Motion Artifacts for Time-of-Flight Cameras", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20090101), vol. 5742, pages 16 - 27, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-03778-8_2, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-54-045234-8, XP055168556 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-03778-8_2 | [A] - YU-WING TAI ET AL, "Coded exposure imaging for projective motion deblurring", 2010 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), 13-18 JUNE 2010, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100613), ISBN 978-1-4244-6984-0, pages 2408 - 2415, XP031725764 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6501910 (KINDAICHI TAKESHI [JP]); | [A]WO2009024349 (HONDA RES INST EUROPE GMBH [DE], et al) |