EP2730455 - DRIVE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI, Masatoshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, 351-0193 Saitama / JP | 02 /
ANDO, Satoshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, 351-0193 Saitama / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Masayuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, 351-0193 Saitama / JP | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12808183.3 | 04.07.2012 | [2019/06] | WO2012JP67131 | Priority number, date | JP20110148489 | 04.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011148489 | [2014/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013005783 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730455 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730455 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20, B60W20/50, B60W30/184, B60W30/045, B60K6/448, B60K6/52, B60K6/547, // B60W50/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (KR);
B60W20/00 (KR,US);
B60K17/046 (EP,US);
B60K17/356 (KR);
B60K6/44 (KR);
B60K6/448 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60L15/2036 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/10 (KR);
B60W10/16 (US);
B60W20/13 (EP,US);
B60W30/1843 (EP,US);
H02P3/14 (KR);
H02P5/68 (US);
B60K2007/0046 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (EP,US);
B60L2220/46 (EP,US);
B60W20/50 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0091 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (US);
B60W2520/30 (EP,US);
B60W2720/406 (EP,US);
B60W30/045 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/427 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | B60L15/20, B60K6/442, B60K6/52, B60K6/547, B60W20/00, F16H48/34, B60W30/184, // B60W50/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/20] | B60L15/20, B60K6/442, B60K6/52, B60K6/547, B60W20/00, F16H48/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2014/20] | English: | DRIVE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2014/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION POUR VÉHICULE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2014 | Translation filed | 03.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2012 | AL | 06.02.2019 | AT | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | ES | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | IE | 04.07.2019 | LU | 04.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5453930 (IMASEKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 39 *; | [A]EP0775607 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * page 20, line 50 - page 22, line 32 *; | [ID]JP2007210586 (HITACHI LTD) [ID] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0040] , [0044] , [0058] *; | [A]EP2008900 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0012] *; | [Y]JP2009033888 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] - [0059] , [0060] *; | [A]EP2055597 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] *; | [XY]US2010004090 (MIZUTANI RYOJI [JP], et al) [X] 23 * paragraph [0078] * [Y] 1-22 | International search | [X]JPH11301293 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2004112851 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2007210586 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2009177994 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2010236674 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]WO2011013829 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2006166508 | JP2007210586 | JP2011148489 |