EP2791137 - PYRAZOLOPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION PROCESS THEREFOR AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2019/04] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALCOUFFE, Chantal c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
BJEGARDE, Kirsten c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
MAUGER, Jacques c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/43] | Catillon, Marie Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12808328.4 | 13.12.2012 | [2019/04] | WO2012EP75328 | Priority number, date | FR20110061589 | 14.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1161589 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013087744 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791137 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2791137 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P35/00, A61P35/04 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/538 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/5355 (CN);
A61K31/536 (CN);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | 14.07.2014 | ME | 14.07.2014 | Title | German: | PYRAZOLOPYRIDINDERIVATE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/43] | English: | PYRAZOLOPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION PROCESS THEREFOR AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF | [2014/43] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRAZOLOPYRIDINE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLABORATION DE CES DÉRIVÉS, ET UTILISATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE CEUX-CI | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 28.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2012 | AL | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 23.01.2019 | |
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 23.01.2019 | |
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 23.01.2019 | |
NO | 23.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006050076 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2006124863 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2006130673 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2008028617 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2008182844 (BJERGARDE KIRSTEN [US], et al) [A] 1-17* claim 1 *; | [A]US2009030010 (SCHWEDE WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2009038385 (CHOONGWAE PHARMA CORP [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2010078427 (ARQULE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011045344 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 * | Examination | WO2009069032 | - CHEBANOV V. A. ET AL., "Cyclocondensation reactions of 5-aminopyrazoles, pyruvic acids and aldehydes. Multicomponent approaches to pyrazolopyridines and related products", TETRAHEDRON, (20061211), vol. 63, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tet.2006.11.048, pages 1229 - 1242, XP005811221 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2006.11.048 | by applicant | - GREENE ET AL., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC | - POLISH JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1983), vol. 57, page 789 | - KESHET E.; BEN-SASSON S.A., J. CLIN. INVEST, (1999), vol. 501, pages 104 - 1497 | - PRESTA M.; RUSNATI M.; DELL'ERA P.; TANGHETTI E.; URBINATI C.; GIULIANI R. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST, PLENUM PUBLISHERS, (2000), pages 7 - 34 | - BILLOTTET C.; JANJI B.; THIERY J.P.; JOUANNEAU J., ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 8128 - 8139 | - CHANDLER L.A.; SOSNOWSKI B.A.; GREENLEES L.; AUKERMAN S.L.; BAIRD A.; PIERCE G.F., INT. J. CANCER, (1999), vol. 58, pages 81 - 451 | - GIRI D.; ROPIQUET F., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 71, pages 5 - 1063 | - DOLL J.A.; REIHER F.K.; CRAWFORD S.E.; PINS M.R.; CAMPBELL S.C.; BOUCK N.P., PROSTATE, (2001), vol. 305, pages 49 - 293 | - VERCOUTTER-EDOUART A-S; CZESZAK X; CREPIN M; LEMOINE J; BOILLY B; LE BOURHIS X ET AL., EXP.CELL RES., (2001), vol. 262, pages 59 - 68 | - YAYON A.; MA Y-S; SAFRAN M.; KLAGSBRUN M.; HALABAN R., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, pages 2999 - 3009 | - YAMADA S.M.; YAMAGUCHI F.; BROWN R.; BERGER M.S.; MORRISON R.S., GLIA, (1999), vol. 76, pages 28 - 66 | - AUGUSTE P.; GURSEL D.B.; LEMIERE S.; REIMERS D.; CUEVAS P.; CARCELLER F. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 26, pages 61 - 1717 | - THOMAS D.A.; GILES F.J.; CORTES J.; ALBITAR M.; KANTARJIAN H.M., ACTA HAEMATOL., (2001), vol. 207, pages 106 - 190 | - GABRILOVE J.L., ONCOLOGIST, (2001), vol. 6, pages 4 - 7 | - EPSTEIN C.E.; SIEGALL C.B.; BIRO S; FU Y.M.; FITZGERALD D., CIRCULATION, (1991), vol. 87, pages 84 - 778 | - WALTENBERGER J., CIRCULATION, (1997), pages 96 - 4083 | - SCHULTZ JEJ; WITT S.A.; NIEMAN M.L.; REISER P.J.; ENGLE S.J.; ZHOU M. ET AL., J.CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 19, pages 104 - 709 | - TILTON R.G.; DIXON R.A.F.; BROCK T.A., EXP. OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS, (1997), vol. 84, pages 6 - 1671 | - YAMASHITA A; YONEMITSU Y; OKANO S; NAKAGAWA K; NAKASHIMA Y; IRISA T ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 57, pages 168 - 450 | - MANABE N; ODA H; NAKAMURA K; KUGA Y; UCHIDA S; KAWAGUCHI H, RHEUMATOL, (1999), vol. 20, pages 38 - 714 | - WALSH D.A., CURR. OPIN. RHEUMATOL., (200409), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 609 - 15 | - KANAZAWA S; TSUNODA T; ONUMA E; MAJIMA T; KAGIYAMA M; KKUCHI K, AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 28, pages 96 - 822 | - THORN M; RAAB Y; LARSSON A; GERDIN B; HALLGREN R, SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 12, pages 35 - 408 | - CHEN L.; ADAR R.; YANG X.; MONSONEGO E.O.; LI C.; HAUSCHKA P.V.; YAGON A.; DENG C.X., THE JOURN. OF CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, no. 11, pages 1517 - 1525 | - RUPNICK M.A. ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, no. 16, pages 10730 - 10735 |