Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014092727 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015298063 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150096441 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6154910B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2017 | B2 | JP2016504189 | 12.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104837543B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2017 | B | CN104837543 | 12.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2931407 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2893529 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69786 | 14.12.2012 |