EP2931407 - FLAT REVERSE OSMOSIS MODULE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEICHEL, John Thomas 5951 Clearwater Drive Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343-8995 / US | 02 /
BEAUCHAMP, Philip Paul 17 Riverwind Drive Rexford, New York 12148 / US | 03 /
ANDERSON, Todd Alan 802 Downing Street Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 04 /
MARSCHKE, Dean David 5951 Clearwater Drive Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343-8995 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Fonquernie, Sophie Benedicte, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Lee, Brenda, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12809060.2 | 14.12.2012 | [2015/43] | WO2012US69786 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014092727 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931407 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/08, B01D65/08 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
B01D63/081 (EP,US);
B01D63/082 (EP,US);
B01D61/025 (US);
B01D61/027 (US);
B01D63/084 (EP,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
B01D2313/02 (EP,US);
B01D2313/12 (EP,US);
B01D2313/2011 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | FLACHES UMKEHROSMOSEMODUL UND SYSTEM | [2015/43] | English: | FLAT REVERSE OSMOSIS MODULE AND SYSTEM | [2015/43] | French: | MODULE ET SYSTÈME D'OSMOSE INVERSE PLAT | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]NL7415083 (WAFILIN BV); | [XI]JPS5651211 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO); | [XI]JPS5654905U ; | [XI]WO8101371 (GEESTHACHT GKSS FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [XI]US2005126966 (TANIDA KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5104532 | JPH0768137B | US5681464 | US6524478 | EP1355730 | US7892430 |