EP2766363 - POLYMORPHS OF ARRY-380, A SELECTIVE HERB2 INHIBITOR AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSON. Donald T. c/o Array BioPharma Inc., 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | 02 /
LINDEMANN, Christopher M. c/o Array BioPharma Inc., 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, ColorDO 80301 / US | 03 /
WATSON, Daniel J. c/o Array BioPharma Inc., 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2014/34] | Application number, filing date | 12809374.7 | 12.10.2012 | WO2012US60138 | Priority number, date | US201161547615P | 14.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161547615 P | US201261606185P | 02.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261606185 P | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013056183 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2766363 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P35/00 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07B2200/13 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | 13.05.2014 | ME | 13.05.2014 | Title | German: | POLYMORPHE VON ARRY-380, SELEKTIVER HERB2-INHIBITOR UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2014/34] | English: | POLYMORPHS OF ARRY-380, A SELECTIVE HERB2 INHIBITOR AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | [2014/34] | French: | POLYMORPHES DE ARRY-380, INHIBITEUR SÉLECTIF DE HERB2 ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2007059257 (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 176-196 * example 11 * [A] 1-175; | [T] - CAIRA M R, "CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPHISM OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19980101), vol. 198, doi:10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5, ISSN 0340-1022, ISBN 978-3-540-36760-4, pages 163 - 208, XP001156954 [T] 1-196 * page 165 - page 166 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | by applicant | WO03077914 | WO2007059257 | - LOUIS F. FIESER; MARY FIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, WILEY, (2006), vol. 1-23, page 1967 |