EP2791414 - METHODS TO FORM AN IONOMER COATING ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECHT, Elliott 2526 Berwyn Road Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | 02 /
FAN, Xiyun Serene 38 Deerborne Trail Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | 03 /
HAYES, Richard Allen 630 Belvedere Drive Beaumont, Texas 77706 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12809931.4 | 12.12.2012 | WO2012US69208 | Priority number, date | US201161569365P | 12.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161569365 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013090406 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791414 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/37, D21H17/43, D21H19/20, D21H19/22 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
D21H17/37 (EP,US);
B32B33/00 (US);
B32B15/08 (US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
D21H17/43 (EP,US);
D21H19/20 (EP,US);
D21H19/22 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249976 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER IONOMEREN BESCHICHTUNG AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2014/43] | English: | METHODS TO FORM AN IONOMER COATING ON A SUBSTRATE | [2014/43] | French: | MÉTHODES DE FORMATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT D'IONOMÈRE SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010101647 (CADWALLADER ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0041] , [0 44] , [0 46] , [0 49] , [0 50] , [0 53] , [0 58] * * claims 1-13 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]US2010272898 (CHEN JOHN CHU [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-14 * * paragraphs [0038] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0054] , [0067] , [0079] - [0083] - [0102] *[I] 2-15 | by applicant | US2313144 | US2632921 | US2648097 | US2683894 | US2704382 | US3264272 | US3296172 | US3321819 | US3338739 | US3355319 | US3389109 | US3404134 | US3472825 | US3562196 | GB1243303 | US3644258 | US3674896 | US3823108 | US3872039 | JPS5084687 | US3896065 | US3899389 | US3904569 | JPS50135141 | US3970626 | US3983268 | US4136069 | US4173669 | US4181566 | US4329305 | US4340659 | US4400440 | US4410655 | US4440908 | US4508804 | US4540736 | US4714728 | US4732814 | US4775713 | JPS649338 | US4970258 | US4978707 | US5028674 | US5082697 | US5155157 | US5160484 | US5206279 | US5244969 | JPH0575769B | JPH06872B | US5292794 | US5304608 | US5330788 | US5336528 | US5374687 | US5387635 | US5409765 | US5419960 | US5430111 | US5445893 | US5542677 | US5550177 | US5591803 | US5591806 | US5688869 | JPH106640 | WO9910276 | JPH11158332 | JP2958120B | US5993604 | US6013353 | WO0044801 | US6100336 | JP2000328046 | US6162852 | US6245858 | EP1163276 | US6458897 | US6482886 | US6500888 | US6518365 | US6852792 | JP2005075878 | US2005100754 | US2005271888 | US2006124554 | US2007117916 | US2007141323 | US2007137808 | US2007137809 | US2007137810 | US2007137811 | US2007137813 | US2007141936 | US2007144697 | US7279513 | US2007243331 | US2007284069 | US2007292705 | US2007295464 | US2007295465 | US2008000598 | US2008000602 | US2008041543 | US2008073045 | US2008073046 | US7364800 | US2008118728 | US2008135195 | US2008176968 | US2008182040 | US2008216977 | US2008230195 | US2008292833 | US2008295985 | US7470736 | JP2009091426 | US7528080 | US2009194450 | US7588662 | US2009253321 | US2009297747 | WO2011058119 | WO2011058121 | WO2011068525 |