Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2791414
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.01.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
17.10.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.05.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2015 |
First examination report |
|
13.02.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
23.12.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
03.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|